NC S99 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 26 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-26 - Referred To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 26 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-26 - Referred To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Bond Referendum Transparency
Title
Bond Referendum Transparency
Sponsors
Sen. Todd Johnson [R] | Sen. Carl Ford [R] | Sen. Eddie Settle [R] | Sen. Joyce Krawiec [R] |
Sen. Timothy Moffitt [R] | Sen. Jim Perry [R] | Sen. Vickie Sawyer [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-26 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-06-22 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 33 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-06-22 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 33 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-26 | House | Referred To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-06-26 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-06-26 | House | Special Message Received From Senate |
2023-06-26 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2023-06-26 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2023-06-22 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2023-06-21 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2023-06-20 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-06-20 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2023-06-20 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Filed |
Subjects
Commissions
Debt/local Government
Elections
Local Government
Local Government Comn.
Notification
Public
Referendum & Initiative
Debt/local Government
Elections
Local Government
Local Government Comn.
Notification
Public
Referendum & Initiative
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
159 | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
159 | 51 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
159 | 52 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
159 | 53 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
159 | 55 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
159 | 55.1 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
159 | 56 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
159 | 58 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
159 | 61 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
69 | 25.1 | (n/a) | Citation Text |