NC S780 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 7 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-07 - Ch. SL 2009-448
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 7 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-07 - Ch. SL 2009-448
Summary
Struc. Settlement Annuities/Ins. Guar. Assn.
Title
Struc. Settlement Annuities/Ins. Guar. Assn.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-07 | Ch. SL 2009-448 | |
2009-08-07 | Signed By Gov. 8/7/2009 | |
2009-07-31 | Pres. To Gov. 7/31/2009 | |
2009-07-30 | Ratified | |
2009-07-29 | Conf Com Withdrawn/dismi | |
2009-07-29 | Concurred In H/com Sub | |
2009-07-29 | Conf Com Withdrawn/dismi | |
2009-06-25 | Conf Com Appointed | |
2009-06-24 | Conf Com Appointed | |
2009-06-24 | Failed Concur In Com Sub | |
2009-06-22 | Placed On Cal For 6/24/2009 | |
2009-06-22 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2009-06-18 | Placed On Cal For 6/22/2009 | |
2009-06-18 | Rec To Concur H Com Sub | |
2009-06-17 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-06-16 | Placed On Cal For 6/17/2009 | |
2009-06-16 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-06-16 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-06-03 | Re-ref Com On Judiciary III | |
2009-06-03 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-05-04 | Ref to the Com on Insurance, if favorable, Judiciary III | |
2009-05-04 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-04-29 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-04-28 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2009-04-28 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-03-25 | Ref To Com On Commerce | |
2009-03-24 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H889 (Same As) 2012-06-29 - Ref To Com On Finance
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=S780 |