NC S346 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 6 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-06 - Ch. SL 2009-430
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 6 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-06 - Ch. SL 2009-430
Summary
Kannapolis Deannexation/Expedite Schools.
Title
Kannapolis Deannexation/Expedite Schools.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-06 | Ch. SL 2009-430 | |
2009-08-06 | Ratified | |
2009-08-06 | Concurred In H/com Sub | |
2009-08-05 | Placed On Cal For 8/6/2009 | |
2009-08-05 | Rec To Concur H Com Sub | |
2009-08-05 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2009-08-05 | Amend Adopted 3 | |
2009-08-04 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2009-08-04 | Amend Adopted 2 | |
2009-08-04 | Amend Adopted 1 | |
2009-07-29 | Postponed To 8/4/2009 | |
2009-07-27 | Postponed To 7/29/2009 | |
2009-07-23 | Postponed To 7/27/2009 | |
2009-07-22 | Placed On Cal For 7/23/2009 | |
2009-07-22 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-07-22 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-07-01 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2009-07-01 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-04-13 | Ref to the Com on Local Government I, if favorable, Finance | |
2009-04-13 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-04-08 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2009-04-07 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2009-04-02 | Placed On Cal For 4/7/2009 | |
2009-04-02 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2009-04-02 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-03-02 | Ref To Com On Finance | |
2009-02-26 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H450 (Same As) 2011-06-17 - Ch. SL 2011-172
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=S346 |