NC S286 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-08 - Ch. SL 2015-141
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-08 - Ch. SL 2015-141
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Regulate the Sale of E-Liquid Containers
Title
Regulate the Sale of E-Liquid Containers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-25 - House - Second Reading (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-08 | Ch. SL 2015-141 | |
2015-07-08 | Signed by Gov. 7/8/2015 | |
2015-06-30 | Pres. To Gov. 06/30/2015 | |
2015-06-29 | Ratified | |
2015-06-25 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2015-06-25 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-06-25 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-06-24 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/25/2015 |
2015-06-24 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2015-06-24 | House | Reptd Fav |
2015-06-10 | House | Re-ref Com On Judiciary II |
2015-06-10 | House | Reptd Fav |
2015-05-27 | House | Re-ref Com On Commerce and Job Development |
2015-05-27 | House | Reptd Fav |
2015-04-27 | House | Ref to the Com on Health, if favorable, Commerce and Job Development |
2015-04-27 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-04-23 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2015-04-22 | Engrossed | |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Health Care |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Filed |