NC S234 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 28 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-06-28 - Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 28 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-06-28 - Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Taxpayer Transparency Act
Title
Taxpayer Transparency Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-28 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-28 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-06-28 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-06-28 | House | Special Message Received From Senate |
2023-06-28 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2023-06-28 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2023-06-28 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2023-06-27 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2023-06-26 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-06-26 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2023-06-26 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Filed |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
105 | 317 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
105 | 328 | (n/a) | Citation Text |