NC H703 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-27 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-27 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Felon W/Gun/B&E/Increased Penalties
Title
Felon W/Gun/B&E/Increased Penalties
Sponsors
Rep. William Brawley [R] | Rep. Nelson Dollar [R] | Rep. Cody Henson [R] | Rep. Hugh Blackwell [R] |
Rep. Mike Clampitt [R] | Rep. Holly Grange [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-26 - House - Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - A1 Brawley Second Reading (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - A1 Brawley Second Reading (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-27 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2017-04-27 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2017-04-26 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2017-04-26 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-04-26 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-04-26 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2017-04-25 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/26/2017 |
2017-04-25 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-04-25 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-04-11 | House | Ref To Com On Judiciary II |
2017-04-11 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-04-10 | House | Filed |