NC H393 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-11 - Ch. SL 2015-12
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-11 - Ch. SL 2015-12
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Tri-County CC/Bd. of Trustees
Title
Tri-County CC/Bd. of Trustees
Sponsors
Rep. Roger West [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-15 - House - Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-11 | Ch. SL 2015-12 | |
2015-05-11 | Ratified | |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Ref To Com On Education/Higher Education |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2015-04-16 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2015-04-15 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-04-15 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-04-14 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/15/2015 |
2015-04-14 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2015-04-14 | House | Reptd Fav |
2015-03-31 | House | Ref To Com On Education - Community Colleges |
2015-03-31 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-03-30 | House | Filed |