NC H1253 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 28 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-30 - Ref To Com On Commerce
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 28 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-30 - Ref To Com On Commerce
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Exempt Time Shares/Rule Against Perpetuities
Title
Exempt Time Shares/Rule Against Perpetuities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-30 | Senate | Ref To Com On Commerce |
2014-06-30 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2014-06-30 | Senate | Special Message Received From House |
2014-06-25 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2014-06-25 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2014-06-25 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2014-06-25 | House | Added to Calendar |
2014-06-25 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2014-06-25 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2014-05-29 | House | Ref To Com On Judiciary Subcommittee A |
2014-05-29 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2014-05-28 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S877 (Same As) 2014-08-05 - Ch. SL 2014-99