NC H1028 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on May 14 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-10 - Ref To Com On Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 14 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-10 - Ref To Com On Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Single License Plate Renewal Sticker
Title
Single License Plate Renewal Sticker
Sponsors
Rep. John Torbett [R] | Rep. Charles Jeter [R] | Rep. Allen McNeill [R] | Rep. Larry Pittman [R] |
Rep. Michael Speciale [R] | Rep. James Whitmire [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-06-04 - House - Second Reading (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-10 | Senate | Ref To Com On Transportation |
2014-06-10 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2014-06-10 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2014-06-05 | House | Regular Message sent to the Senate |
2014-06-04 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2014-06-04 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2014-06-03 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/04/2014 |
2014-06-03 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2014-06-03 | House | Reptd Fav |
2014-05-15 | House | Ref To Com On Transportation |
2014-05-15 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2014-05-14 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S828 (Same As) 2014-05-22 - Ref To Com On Transportation