MT SR83 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-26 - (S) Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-26 - (S) Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Confirm Governor's appointees to the Board of Public Education
Title
Confirm Governor's appointees to the Board of Public Education
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-16 - Senate - (S) Resolution Adopted (Y: 44 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - (S) Education and Cultural Resources Committee Executive Action--Resolution Adopted (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - (S) Education and Cultural Resources Committee Executive Action--Resolution Adopted (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-26 | Senate | (S) Filed with Secretary of State |
2021-03-25 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2021-03-23 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2021-03-23 | Senate | (S) Returned from Enrolling |
2021-03-17 | Senate | (S) Sent to Enrolling |
2021-03-16 | Senate | (S) Resolution Adopted |
2021-03-16 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2021-03-11 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Resolution Adopted (S) Education and Cultural Resources |
2021-03-10 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Resolution Adopted (S) Education and Cultural Resources |
2021-03-10 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Education and Cultural Resources |
2021-02-24 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Education and Cultural Resources |
2021-02-24 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2021-02-24 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2021-02-24 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2021-02-24 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2021-02-24 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2021-02-24 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2021-02-24 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2021-02-23 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2021-02-23 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2021-02-23 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2021-02-23 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2021-02-20 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2021-02-20 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2021-02-19 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2021-02-18 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2021-02-18 | (C) Draft Request Received |