MT SB106 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-22 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-22 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise definition of eligible renewable resource
Title
Revise definition of eligible renewable resource
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-06 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 73 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-05 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 70 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 42 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-05 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 70 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 42 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-22 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2013-04-22 | Senate | (S) Signed by Governor |
2013-04-12 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to Governor |
2013-04-11 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2013-04-11 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2013-04-09 | Senate | (S) Returned from Enrolling |
2013-04-09 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2013-04-09 | Senate | (S) Sent to Enrolling |
2013-04-06 | House | (H) Returned to Senate |
2013-04-06 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2013-04-06 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2013-04-05 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2013-04-05 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-03-16 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (H) Federal Relations, Energy, and Telecommunications |
2013-03-15 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (H) Federal Relations, Energy, and Telecommunications |
2013-03-11 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Federal Relations, Energy, and Telecommunications |
2013-02-26 | House | (H) First Reading |
2013-02-25 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Federal Relations, Energy, and Telecommunications |
2013-02-14 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2013-02-13 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2013-02-13 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2013-02-12 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2013-02-12 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-02-09 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2013-02-09 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Energy and Telecommunications |
2013-02-07 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Energy and Telecommunications |
2013-01-29 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Energy and Telecommunications |
2013-01-09 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Energy and Telecommunications |
2013-01-09 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2013-01-08 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2013-01-08 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2013-01-08 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2012-12-31 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2012-12-28 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2012-12-28 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2012-12-27 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2012-12-27 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2012-12-26 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2012-12-26 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2012-12-12 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2012-12-04 | (C) Draft Request Received |