MT HJ8 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-06 - (H) Filed with Secretary of State  
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-06 - (H) Filed with Secretary of State  
Summary
Provide for combining E. Montana AG extension office with research facility
Title
Provide for combining E. Montana AG extension office with research facility
Sponsors
Rep. Dave Kasten [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-06 | (H) Filed with Secretary of State   | |
2009-03-06 | (S) Signed by President   | |
2009-03-05 | (H) Signed by Speaker   | |
2009-03-05 | (H) Returned from Enrolling   | |
2009-03-04 | (C) Printed - New Version Available   | |
2009-03-04 | (H) Sent to Enrolling   | |
2009-03-04 | (H) 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by Senate   | |
2009-03-04 | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading   | |
2009-03-03 | (H) 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Concurred   | |
2009-03-03 | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading   | |
2009-02-26 | (S) Returned to House with Amendments   | |
2009-02-26 | (S) 3rd Reading Concurred   | |
2009-02-26 | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading   | |
2009-02-25 | (C) Printed - New Version Available   | |
2009-02-25 | (S) 2nd Reading Concurred as Amended on Voice Vote   | |
2009-02-25 | (S) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried on Voice Vote   | |
2009-02-25 | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading   | |
2009-02-19 | (C) Printed - New Version Available   | |
2009-02-19 | (S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended (S) Finance and Claims | |
2009-02-19 | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (S) Finance and Claims | |
2009-02-17 | (S) Hearing (S) Finance and Claims | |
2009-02-13 | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Finance and Claims | |
2009-02-13 | (S) First Reading   | |
2009-02-04 | (H) Transmitted to Senate   | |
2009-02-03 | (H) 3rd Reading Passed   | |
2009-02-03 | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading   | |
2009-02-02 | (H) Reconsidered Previous Action; Remains in 3rd Reading Process   | |
2009-02-02 | (H) Rereferred to Committee (H) Appropriations | |
2009-02-02 | (H) 2nd Reading Passed   | |
2009-02-02 | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading   | |
2009-01-30 | (C) Printed - New Version Available   | |
2009-01-30 | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Appropriations | |
2009-01-30 | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Appropriations | |
2009-01-28 | (H) Hearing (H) Appropriations | |
2009-01-19 | (H) Fiscal Note Printed   | |
2009-01-14 | (H) Fiscal Note Received   | |
2009-01-08 | (H) Rereferred to Committee (H) Appropriations | |
2009-01-06 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically   | |
2009-01-06 | (H) Fiscal Note Requested   | |
2009-01-06 | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Education | |
2009-01-06 | (H) First Reading   | |
2009-01-06 | (H) Introduced   | |
2009-01-05 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester   | |
2009-01-02 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery   | |
2008-12-22 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review   | |
2008-12-22 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review   | |
2008-12-22 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically   | |
2008-12-22 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing   | |
2008-12-20 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SAB]   | |
2008-12-20 | (C) Draft in Edit   | |
2008-12-19 | (C) Draft in Legal Review   | |
2008-12-17 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review   | |
2008-12-17 | (C) Draft Back for Requester Changes   | |
2008-12-08 | (C) Draft On Hold   | |
2008-12-04 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review   | |
2008-11-28 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review   | |
2008-11-24 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable   | |
2008-11-24 | (C) Draft Request Received   |
Subjects
Montana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://laws.leg.mt.gov/laws09/LAW0210W$BSIV.ActionQuery?P_BILL_NO1=8&P_BLTP_BILL_TYP_CD=HJ&Z_ACTION=Find |