MT HJ33 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-02 - (H) Filed with Secretary of State  
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-02 - (H) Filed with Secretary of State  
Summary
Address receipt and expenditure of federal jobs and economic stimulus package
Title
Address receipt and expenditure of federal jobs and economic stimulus package
Sponsors
Rep. Bob Bergren [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-02 | (H) Filed with Secretary of State   | |
2009-04-02 | (S) Signed by President   | |
2009-04-02 | (H) Signed by Speaker   | |
2009-04-02 | (H) Returned from Enrolling   | |
2009-04-01 | (C) Printed - New Version Available   | |
2009-04-01 | (H) Sent to Enrolling   | |
2009-04-01 | (H) 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by Senate   | |
2009-04-01 | (H) On Motion Rules Suspended   | |
2009-04-01 | (H) 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Concurred   | |
2009-04-01 | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading   | |
2009-03-31 | (S) Returned to House with Amendments   | |
2009-03-31 | (S) 3rd Reading Concurred   | |
2009-03-31 | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading   | |
2009-03-30 | (S) 2nd Reading Concurred on Voice Vote   | |
2009-03-30 | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading   | |
2009-03-26 | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading   | |
2009-03-24 | (C) Printed - New Version Available   | |
2009-03-24 | (S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended (S) Finance and Claims | |
2009-03-24 | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (S) Finance and Claims | |
2009-03-23 | (S) Hearing (S) Finance and Claims | |
2009-03-19 | (S) First Reading   | |
2009-03-19 | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Finance and Claims | |
2009-03-18 | (H) Transmitted to Senate   | |
2009-03-18 | (H) 3rd Reading Passed   | |
2009-03-18 | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading   | |
2009-03-17 | (H) 2nd Reading Passed   | |
2009-03-17 | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading   | |
2009-03-16 | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed (H) Appropriations | |
2009-03-16 | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (H) Appropriations | |
2009-03-13 | (H) Hearing (H) Appropriations | |
2009-03-13 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically   | |
2009-03-12 | (H) First Reading   | |
2009-03-12 | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Appropriations | |
2009-03-12 | (H) Introduced   | |
2009-03-12 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester   | |
2009-03-12 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery   | |
2009-03-12 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review   | |
2009-03-12 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review   | |
2009-03-12 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing   | |
2009-03-12 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically   | |
2009-03-12 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]   | |
2009-03-12 | (C) Draft in Edit   | |
2009-03-12 | (C) Draft in Legal Review   | |
2009-03-12 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review   | |
2009-01-21 | (C) Draft On Hold   | |
2009-01-16 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable   | |
2009-01-16 | (C) Draft Request Received   |
Subjects
Montana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://laws.leg.mt.gov/laws09/LAW0210W$BSIV.ActionQuery?P_BILL_NO1=33&P_BLTP_BILL_TYP_CD=HJ&Z_ACTION=Find |