MT HJ32 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-30 - (H) Filed with Secretary of State  
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-30 - (H) Filed with Secretary of State  
Summary
Study impact of historic preservation and strategies for preservation
Title
Study impact of historic preservation and strategies for preservation
Sponsors
Rep. Bob Ebinger [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-30 | (H) Filed with Secretary of State   | |
2009-04-30 | (S) Signed by President   | |
2009-04-30 | (H) Signed by Speaker   | |
2009-04-28 | (C) Printed - New Version Available   | |
2009-04-28 | (H) Returned from Enrolling   | |
2009-04-28 | (H) Sent to Enrolling   | |
2009-04-28 | (S) Returned to House   | |
2009-04-28 | (S) 3rd Reading Concurred   | |
2009-04-28 | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading   | |
2009-04-27 | (S) 2nd Reading Concurred on Voice Vote   | |
2009-04-27 | (S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (S) Local Government | |
2009-04-27 | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (S) Local Government | |
2009-04-27 | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading   | |
2009-04-23 | (S) Hearing (S) Local Government | |
2009-04-22 | (S) First Reading   | |
2009-04-21 | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Local Government | |
2009-04-20 | (H) Transmitted to Senate   | |
2009-04-20 | (H) 3rd Reading Passed   | |
2009-04-20 | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading   | |
2009-04-18 | (H) 2nd Reading Passed   | |
2009-04-18 | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading   | |
2009-04-08 | (C) Printed - New Version Available   | |
2009-04-08 | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Taxation | |
2009-04-08 | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Taxation | |
2009-04-01 | (H) Hearing (H) Taxation | |
2009-03-27 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically   | |
2009-03-27 | (H) First Reading   | |
2009-03-27 | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Taxation | |
2009-03-27 | (H) Introduced   | |
2009-03-25 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester   | |
2009-03-24 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review   | |
2009-03-24 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery   | |
2009-03-24 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review   | |
2009-03-24 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review   | |
2009-03-24 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically   | |
2009-03-24 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing   | |
2009-03-24 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [JLN]   | |
2009-03-24 | (C) Draft in Edit   | |
2009-03-23 | (C) Draft in Legal Review   | |
2009-03-23 | (C) Draft Back for Requester Changes   | |
2009-03-20 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review   | |
2009-03-20 | (C) Draft Back for Requester Changes   | |
2009-03-19 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review   | |
2009-03-19 | (C) Draft Taken Off Hold   | |
2008-12-17 | (C) Draft On Hold   | |
2008-12-05 | (C) Draft Request Received   |
Subjects
Montana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://laws.leg.mt.gov/laws09/LAW0210W$BSIV.ActionQuery?P_BILL_NO1=32&P_BLTP_BILL_TYP_CD=HJ&Z_ACTION=Find |