MT HB574 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-31 - (H) Missed Deadline for Appropriation Bill Transmittal
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-31 - (H) Missed Deadline for Appropriation Bill Transmittal
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Revise compensation definition and funding in police and fire retirement systems
Title
Revise compensation definition and funding in police and fire retirement systems
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-26 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 76 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - House - (H) State Administration Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - House - (H) State Administration Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-31 | House | (H) Missed Deadline for Appropriation Bill Transmittal |
2015-03-27 | House | (H) Tabled in Committee (H) Appropriations |
2015-03-27 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Appropriations |
2015-03-26 | House | (H) Rereferred to Committee (H) Appropriations |
2015-03-26 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2015-03-26 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-03-25 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Requested |
2015-03-24 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2015-03-24 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (H) State Administration |
2015-03-24 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (H) State Administration |
2015-03-18 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Printed |
2015-03-17 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Signed |
2015-03-16 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Received |
2015-03-12 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Requested |
2015-03-10 | House | (H) Hearing (H) State Administration |
2015-03-06 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Printed |
2015-03-06 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Signed |
2015-03-05 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Received |
2015-03-04 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Requested |
2015-02-27 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Printed |
2015-02-26 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Signed |
2015-02-25 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Received |
2015-02-19 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2015-02-19 | House | (H) First Reading |
2015-02-19 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) State Administration |
2015-02-19 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Requested |
2015-02-19 | House | (H) Introduced |
2015-02-18 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2015-02-17 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2015-02-17 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2015-02-17 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2015-02-17 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2015-02-17 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2015-02-17 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2015-02-17 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [JLN] | |
2015-02-16 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2015-02-16 | (C) Draft Back for Redo | |
2015-02-16 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2015-02-16 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2015-02-16 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2015-02-16 | (C) Draft Taken Off Hold | |
2014-12-06 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2014-12-05 | (C) Draft Request Received |