MS SB2917 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-17 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-17 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 49-15-313, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require A Lifetime Saltwater Sports Fishing License For Persons 65 Or Older For A Limited One-time Fee; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Saltwater fishing license; require lifetime license for persons 65 and older for a one-time fee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-03 - House - House Passed (Y: 117 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-04 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-04 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-17 | Approved by Governor | |
2010-03-11 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-03-11 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-03-04 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2010-03-03 | Passed | |
2010-02-24 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2010-02-09 | Referred To Marine Resources | |
2010-02-05 | Transmitted To House | |
2010-02-04 | Passed | |
2010-01-27 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2010-01-18 | Referred To Ports and Marine Resources |