MS HR54 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A Resolution Commending And Congratulating Desoto County Native Dan Arata Upon Representing The State Of Mississippi At The 2018 Special Olympics National Games In Seattle, Washington, On July 1-6, 2018.
Title
Dan Arata; commend upon representing the State of Mississippi at the 2018 Special Olympics National Games.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Eubanks [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-05 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-04 | House | Immediate Release |
2019-03-04 | House | Adopted As Amended |
2019-03-04 | House | Amended |
2019-02-28 | House | Title Suff Adopted As Amended |
2019-02-20 | House | Referred To Rules |