MS HR31 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on February 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-23 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on February 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-23 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A Resolution Commending And Congratulating Dr. Leslie Burl Mclemore Upon Being Presented The Prestigious Cora Norman Award By The Mississippi Humanities Council.
Title
Dr. Leslie Burl McLemore; commend upon receipt of Cora Norman Award.
Sponsors
Rep. Ashley Henley [R] | Rep. Dana Criswell [R] | Rep. Dan Eubanks [R] | Rep. Robert Foster [R] |
Rep. Jeff Hale [R] | Rep. Steve Hopkins [R] | Rep. Bill Kinkade [R] | Rep. Debra Gibbs [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-23 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-02-22 | House | Immediate Release |
2018-02-22 | House | Adopted |
2018-02-21 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2018-02-15 | House | Referred To Rules |