MS HR30 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on February 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-23 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on February 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-23 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A Resolution Commending Omega Psi Phi Fraternity, Inc., For Its Outstanding Community Service And Philanthropy And Designating February 15, 2018, As "omega Psi Phi Day" In Mississippi.
Title
Omega Psi Phi Day; designate as February 15, 2018, in Mississippi.
Sponsors
Rep. Christopher Bell [D] | Rep. Willie Bailey [D] | Rep. Edward Blackmon [D] | Rep. Rufus Straughter [D] |
Rep. Cheikh Taylor [D] | Rep. Kenneth Walker [D] | Rep. Percy Watson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-23 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-02-22 | House | Immediate Release |
2018-02-22 | House | Adopted |
2018-02-21 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2018-02-14 | House | Referred To Rules |