MS HC102 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 4 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-04 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 4 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-04 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending And Congratulating The Mccomb High School Boys Basketball Team And Head Coach Hilton Harrell For Their Outstanding 2012-2013 Season And For Winning District 6 5a, South State Runner-up And A Trip To The Final Four.
Title
McComb High School Tigers Boys Basketball Team; commend and congratulate upon finishing successful 2012-2013 season.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-28 - House - House Adopted (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-04 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Referred To Rules |
2013-03-28 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2013-03-28 | House | Immediate Release |
2013-03-28 | House | Adopted |
2013-03-27 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2013-03-26 | House | Referred To Rules |