MS HB1661 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-14 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-14 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 27-65-111, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Exempt From Sales Taxation Sales Of Coins, Currency And Bullion; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Sales tax; exempt sales of coins, currency and bullion.
Sponsors
Rep. Jody Steverson [R] | Rep. Jill Ford [R] | Rep. Dan Eubanks [R] | Rep. Randy Boyd [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-21 - House - House Passed (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-14 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Referred To Finance |
2023-02-22 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2023-02-21 | House | Passed |
2023-02-21 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2023-02-15 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2023-02-15 | House | Referred To Ways and Means |