MS HB1551 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 28 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-28 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 28 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-28 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize The Board Of Supervisors Of Tishomingo County, Mississippi, To Levy An Additional 1% Tax Upon The Gross Proceeds Of Sales Of Restaurants; To Provide That The Tax Shall Be Used To Promote Tourism; To Provide For An Election On Whether The Tax May Be Levied; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Tishomingo County; authorize to impose a tax on restaurants to fund promotion of tourism.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-27 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-12 - House - House Passed (Y: 87 N: 28 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-12 - House - House Passed (Y: 87 N: 28 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-28 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2012-04-28 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2012-04-27 | Transmitted To House | |
2012-04-27 | Immediate Release | |
2012-04-27 | Passed | |
2012-04-26 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2012-04-25 | DR - TSDP: LP To FI | |
2012-04-19 | Referred To Local and Private;Finance | |
2012-04-18 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2012-04-18 | Motion to Reconsider Tabled | |
2012-04-12 | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Moak, Warren, Holland) | |
2012-04-12 | Passed | |
2012-04-12 | Committee Substitute Adopted | |
2012-04-03 | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub | |
2012-04-02 | DR - TSDPCS: TO To LP | |
2012-03-28 | DR - TSDP: LP To TO | |
2012-03-13 | Referred To Local and Private Legislation;Tourism |