MO SJR46 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-13 - H Calendar Senate Joint Resolutions for Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-13 - H Calendar Senate Joint Resolutions for Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires all county assessors to be elected
Title
Requires all county assessors to be elected
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-13 | House | H Calendar Senate Joint Resolutions for Third Reading |
2022-04-27 | House | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2022-04-27 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2022-04-25 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review |
2022-04-25 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2022-04-25 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2022-04-20 | House | Referred H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2022-04-20 | House | Reported Do Pass H Downsizing State Government |
2022-04-20 | House | Voted Do Pass H Downsizing State Government |
2022-04-13 | House | Hearing Conducted H Downsizing State Government |
2022-04-11 | House | Referred H Downsizing State Government |
2022-04-11 | House | H Second Read |
2022-04-07 | House | H First Read |
2022-04-07 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Reported from S Governmental Oversight and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Referred S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Perfected |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Reported from S Local Government and Elections Committee |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Local Government and Elections Committee |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Local Government and Elections Committee |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Local Government and Elections Committee |
2022-01-05 | Senate | S First Read |
2021-12-21 | Senate | Prefiled |