MO SJR12 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-15 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SJR 12-Onder, with SCS (pending)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-15 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SJR 12-Onder, with SCS (pending)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Proposes a constitutional amendment guaranteeing parents the fundamental right to control the education of their minor children
Title
Proposes a constitutional amendment guaranteeing parents the fundamental right to control the education of their minor children
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-15 | Senate | S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SJR 12-Onder, with SCS (pending) |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2015-04-14 | Senate | SA 2 to SCS S offered & withdrawn (Holsman)--(0816S05.03S) |
2015-04-14 | Senate | SA 1 to SCS S offered & adopted (Sifton)--(0816S05.02S) |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Reported from S Education Committee to Floor w/SCS |
2015-04-01 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Education Committee (0816S.05C) |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Education Committee |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Education Committee |
2015-01-26 | Senate | S First Read--SJR 12-Onder |