MO SB960 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-01 - Hearing Cancelled S Economic Development Committee
Pending: Senate Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-01 - Hearing Cancelled S Economic Development Committee
Pending: Senate Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the Show MO Act
Title
Establishes the Show MO Act
Sponsors
Sen. Doug Beck [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-01 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled S Economic Development Committee |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Economic Development Committee |
2022-01-05 | Senate | S First Read |
2021-12-02 | Senate | Prefiled |