MO SB727 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-18 - H Calendar S Bills for Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-18 - H Calendar S Bills for Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Creates a child care subsidy pilot program for parents to continue to receive subsidies while sharing in the costs of the benefits by enacting the Low-Wage Trap Elimination Act
Title
Creates a child care subsidy pilot program for parents to continue to receive subsidies while sharing in the costs of the benefits by enacting the Low-Wage Trap Elimination Act
Sponsors
Sen. Rob Schaaf [R] | Sen. Ryan Silvey [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-18 | H Calendar S Bills for Third Reading | |
2012-05-16 | Reported Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee | |
2012-05-10 | Voted Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee | |
2012-05-10 | Hearing Conducted H Rules Purusant Committee | |
2012-04-30 | Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) | |
2012-04-30 | Reported Do Pass H Children and Families Committee | |
2012-04-25 | Voted Do Pass H Children and Families Committee | |
2012-04-25 | Hearing Conducted H Children and Families Committee | |
2012-04-17 | Referred H Children and Families Committee | |
2012-04-10 | H Second Read | |
2012-04-05 | H First Read | |
2012-04-05 | S Third Read and Passed | |
2012-04-05 | Reported from S Ways & Means and Fiscal Oversight Committee to Floor | |
2012-04-05 | Voted Do Pass S Ways & Means and Fiscal Oversight Committee | |
2012-04-03 | Referred S Ways & Means and Fiscal Oversight Committee | |
2012-04-03 | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee | |
2012-04-03 | Perfected | |
2012-03-21 | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar | |
2012-03-21 | SS, as amended, S adopted | |
2012-03-21 | SA 1 to SS S offered & adopted (Chappelle-Nadal)--(5619S05.01S) | |
2012-03-05 | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar | |
2012-03-05 | SS S offered (Schaaf)--(5619S.05F) | |
2012-02-29 | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar | |
2012-02-23 | Reported from S Health, Mental Health, Seniors and Families Committee to Floor | |
2012-02-21 | Voted Do Pass S Health, Mental Health, Seniors and Families Committee | |
2012-02-14 | Hearing Conducted S Health, Mental Health, Seniors and Families Committee | |
2012-02-02 | Second Read and Referred S Health, Mental Health, Seniors and Families Committee | |
2012-02-01 | S First Read--SB 727-Schaaf |