MO SB603 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-03 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Government Reform Committee (3777S.03C)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-03 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Government Reform Committee (3777S.03C)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to charter schools
Title
Modifies provisions relating to charter schools
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Government Reform Committee (3777S.03C) |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Government Reform Committee |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Government Reform Committee |
2020-01-08 | Senate | S First Read--SB 603-O'Laughlin |
2019-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |