MO SB592 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-05 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-05 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies several provisions relating to elections
Title
Modifies several provisions relating to elections
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - House - House: SB 592 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 139 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - House - House: SB 592 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 139 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-05 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2018-04-19 | House | S Third Read and Passed |
2018-04-19 | House | S concurs in HA 3 |
2018-04-19 | House | S concurs in HA 1 |
2018-04-12 | House | Motion to concur in HA 1 offered (Hegeman) - Motion withdrawn |
2018-04-10 | House | H Third Read and Passed, as amended |
2018-04-10 | House | HA 3 H offered & adopted (Unsicker)--(4580S08.09H) |
2018-04-10 | House | HA 2, as amended, H withdrawn |
2018-04-10 | House | HA 1 to HA 2 H offered (Grier)--(4580S08.23H) |
2018-04-10 | House | HA 2 H offered (Dogan)--(4850S08.15H) |
2018-04-10 | House | HA 1 H offered & adopted (Shaul)--(4850S08.22H) |
2018-04-09 | House | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2018-04-09 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2018-04-05 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2018-04-05 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2018-04-04 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2018-03-29 | House | Referred H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2018-03-29 | House | Reported Do Pass H Elections and Elected Officials |
2018-03-28 | House | Voted Do Pass H Elections and Elected Officials |
2018-03-28 | House | Hearing Conducted H Elections and Elected Officials |
2018-03-27 | House | Referred H Elections and Elected Officials |
2018-03-12 | House | H Second Read |
2018-03-08 | House | H First Read |
2018-03-08 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Reported from S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Referred S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Perfected |
2018-03-06 | Senate | SS for SCS S adopted |
2018-03-06 | Senate | SA 1 to SS for SCS S withdrawn |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Bill placed on Informal Calendar |
2018-02-28 | Senate | SA 1 to SS for SCS S offered (Dixon)--(4850S08.03S) |
2018-02-28 | Senate | SS for SCS S offered (Hegeman)--(4850S.08F) |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Reported from S Local Government and Elections Committee w/SCS |
2018-02-13 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Local Government and Elections Committee (4850S.05C) |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Local Government and Elections Committee |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Local Government and Elections Committee |
2018-01-03 | Senate | S First Read--SB 592-Hegeman |
2017-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |