MO SB457 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-15 - H Calendar S Bills for Third Reading w/HCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-15 - H Calendar S Bills for Third Reading w/HCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to health care professional and services
Title
Modifies provisions relating to health care professional and services
Sponsors
Sen. David Sater [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-15 | House | H Calendar S Bills for Third Reading w/HCS |
2015-05-12 | House | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2015-05-12 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2015-05-11 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2015-05-08 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Select Committee on Insurance (Pursuant to H Rule 27.8) |
2015-05-07 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Select Committee on Insurance (Pursuant to H Rule 27.8) |
2015-05-05 | House | Referred H Select Committee on Insurance (Pursuant to H Rule 27.8) |
2015-05-05 | House | Reported Do Pass H Health Insurance |
2015-05-05 | House | Voted Do Pass H Health Insurance |
2015-05-05 | House | Hearing Conducted H Health Insurance |
2015-04-22 | House | Referred H Health Insurance Committee |
2015-04-22 | House | H Second Read |
2015-04-21 | House | H First Read |
2015-04-21 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Perfected |
2015-04-16 | Senate | SS S offered & adopted (Sater)--(2178S.02F) |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Reported from S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee to Floor |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Removed S Consent Calendar |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Reported from S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee to Floor - Consent |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Motion to pass bill as consent taken by S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee - Consent vote adopted |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee |
2015-02-18 | Senate | S First Read--SB 457-Sater |