MO SB330 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-29 - Hearing Conducted H Select Committee on Budget
Pending: House Select Committee on Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-29 - Hearing Conducted H Select Committee on Budget
Pending: House Select Committee on Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to bond issuance
Title
Modifies provisions relating to bond issuance
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Parson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-29 | House | Hearing Conducted H Select Committee on Budget |
2015-04-27 | House | Referred H Select Committee on Budget |
2015-03-20 | House | H Second Read |
2015-03-19 | House | H First Read |
2015-03-19 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed - EC adopted |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Perfected |
2015-03-16 | Senate | SS, as amended, S adopted |
2015-03-16 | Senate | SA 2 to SS S offered & adopted (Parson)--(0745S05.05S) |
2015-03-16 | Senate | SA 1 to SS S offered & adopted (Silvey)--(0745S05.01S) |
2015-03-16 | Senate | SS S offered (Parson)--(0745S.05F) |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Taken up for Perfection |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Taken up for Perfection |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Reported from S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee to Floor |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2015-01-27 | Senate | S First Read--SB 330-Parson |