MO SB233 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-15 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 233-Kehoe, with SCS & SA 2 (pending)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-15 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 233-Kehoe, with SCS & SA 2 (pending)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to expert witnesses
Title
Modifies provisions relating to expert witnesses
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Kehoe [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-15 | Senate | S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 233-Kehoe, with SCS & SA 2 (pending) |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2015-03-10 | Senate | SA 2 to SCS S offered (Sifton)--(1217S02.11S) |
2015-03-10 | Senate | SA 1 to SCS S defeated |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Taken up for Perfection |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2015-03-10 | Senate | SA 1 to SCS S offered (Schupp)--(1217S02.06S) |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Reported from S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee to Floor, with SCS |
2015-02-24 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee (1217S.02C) |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee |
2015-01-13 | Senate | S First Read--SB 233-Kehoe |