MO SB1357 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-28 - SCS Voted Do Pass (w/SCS SBs 1357 & 888) Progress and Development Committee (5250S.03C)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-28 - SCS Voted Do Pass (w/SCS SBs 1357 & 888) Progress and Development Committee (5250S.03C)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies the Pregnancy-Associated Mortality Review Board
Title
Modifies the Pregnancy-Associated Mortality Review Board
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-28 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass (w/SCS SBs 1357 & 888) Progress and Development Committee (5250S.03C) |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Progress and Development Committee |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Progress and Development Committee |
2024-01-24 | Senate | S First Read |