MO SB1006 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-05 - Voted Do Pass S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-05 - Voted Do Pass S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals the yield tax on forest croplands
Title
Repeals the yield tax on forest croplands
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-05 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee |
2018-02-15 | Senate | S First Read--SB 1006-Cunningham |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/18info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=75083372 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/18info/pdf-bill/intro/SB1006.pdf |