MO HRB1 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-29 - Voted Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-29 - Voted Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals expired, terminated, sunset, and obsolete sections and portions of sections
Title
Repeals expired, terminated, sunset, and obsolete sections and portions of sections
Sponsors
Rep. Dirk Deaton [R] |
Roll Calls
House - House: HRBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 139 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-29 | Senate | Voted Do Pass (S) |
2024-04-29 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Executive Session Scheduled - Monday, April 29, 2024, 3:00 p.m., Senate Lounge. |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Thursday, April 25, 2024, 8:00 a.m., Senate Lounge. |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Second read and referred: Governmental Accountability(S) |
2024-03-27 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2024-03-27 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 139 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 5 |
2024-03-27 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2024-03-12 | House | Perfected (H) |
2024-03-12 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2024-03-12 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2024-03-12 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2024-02-26 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2024-02-26 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2024-02-26 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2024-02-22 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2024-02-15 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2024-02-14 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2024-02-14 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2024-02-07 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2024-01-25 | House | Referred: Government Efficiency and Downsizing(H) |
2024-01-25 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2024-01-24 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |