MO HCR31 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-11 - Referred: Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics (S)
Pending: Senate Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-11 - Referred: Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics (S)
Pending: Senate Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Calls on the United States Congress to allocate at least 40% of the Land and Water Conservation Fund moneys to the State Assistance program for state and local capital parks projects
Title
Calls on the United States Congress to allocate at least 40% of the Land and Water Conservation Fund moneys to the State Assistance program for state and local capital parks projects
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-11 | Referred: Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics (S) | |
2011-04-06 | Reported to The Senate (S) | |
2011-04-06 | Adopted (H) | |
2011-04-04 | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2011-04-04 | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2011-04-04 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2011-03-17 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2011-03-17 | Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2011-03-17 | Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2011-03-17 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2011-03-17 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2011-03-10 | Referred: Tourism and Natural Resources | |
2011-02-14 | Offered (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HCR31&year=2011&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills111/biltxt/intro/HCR0031I.htm |