MO HB97 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-01-17 - Referred: Workforce Development and Workplace Safety(H)
Pending: House Workforce Development And Workplace Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-01-17 - Referred: Workforce Development and Workplace Safety(H)
Pending: House Workforce Development And Workplace Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the Missouri Housing Development Commission from requiring a prevailing hourly wage to be paid to a contractor on a project eligible for a housing tax credit if it is in a Governor-declared disaster area
Title
Prohibits the Missouri Housing Development Commission from requiring a prevailing hourly wage to be paid to a contractor on a project eligible for a housing tax credit if it is in a Governor-declared disaster area
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-17 | House | Referred: Workforce Development and Workplace Safety(H) |
2013-01-10 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2013-01-09 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2013-01-09 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2012-12-27 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB97&year=2013&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills131/biltxt/intro/HB0097I.htm |