MO HB94 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-01-27 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Agriculture Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-01-27 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Agriculture Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals the Puppy Mill Cruelty Prevention Act passed as Proposition B by voters in November 2010
Title
Repeals the Puppy Mill Cruelty Prevention Act passed as Proposition B by voters in November 2010
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-01-27 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2011-01-25 | Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H) | |
2011-01-20 | Referred: Agriculture Policy (H) | |
2011-01-06 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2011-01-05 | Read First Time (H) | |
2011-01-03 | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB94&year=2011&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills111/biltxt/intro/HB0094I.htm |