MO HB625 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-28 - Referred: Emerging Issues(H)
Pending: House Emerging Issues Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-28 - Referred: Emerging Issues(H)
Pending: House Emerging Issues Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the Competency-based Education Task Force
Title
Establishes the Competency-based Education Task Force
Sponsors
Rep. Doug Richey [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-28 | House | Referred: Emerging Issues(H) |
2021-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2021-01-06 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2021-01-04 | House | Prefiled (H) |