MO HB562 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-05 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-05 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizes certain three-wheeled vehicles as motor vehicles
Title
Recognizes certain three-wheeled vehicles as motor vehicles
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-04 - House - HB 562 HBs 3rd READING - CONSENT (Y: 133 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - HB 562 HBs 3rd READING - CONSENT (Y: 100 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - HB 562 HBs 3rd READING - CONSENT (Y: 100 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-05 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 1, 2015, 8:15am, Senate Committee Room 1 |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Transportation, Infrastructure, and Public Safety(S) |
2015-03-04 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2015-03-04 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 133 NOES: 15 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-03-04 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2015-03-03 | House | Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules (H) |
2015-02-19 | House | Rules - Reported Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2015-02-18 | House | Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2015-02-18 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-02-11 | House | Rules - Action Postponed (H) |
2015-02-11 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-02-10 | House | Referred: Select Committee on Rules(H) |
2015-02-10 | House | Reported Do Pass by Consent (H) |
2015-02-10 | House | Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2015-02-10 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-02-03 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2015-01-27 | House | Referred: Transportation(H) |
2015-01-21 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2015-01-20 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |