MO HB299 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-07 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-07 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions of law relating to child custody arrangements
Title
Modifies provisions of law relating to child custody arrangements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-08 - House - House: HB 299 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 133 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-07 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2021-04-29 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2021-04-28 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass (S) |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 28, 12 noon or upon morning recess, SCR 1 |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Second read and referred: Seniors, Families, Veterans and Military Affairs(S) |
2021-04-08 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2021-04-08 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 133 NOES: 18 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-04-08 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2021-04-06 | House | Perfected (H) |
2021-04-06 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2021-04-06 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2021-03-23 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-03-23 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-03-23 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-03-11 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2021-03-11 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-03-10 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-03-10 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-03-03 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2021-02-25 | House | Referred: Judiciary(H) |
2021-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2021-01-06 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2020-12-02 | House | Prefiled (H) |