MO HB295 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-31 - Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H)
Pending: House Crime Prevention And Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-31 - Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H)
Pending: House Crime Prevention And Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Designates the second Saturday of June each year as "Law Enforcement Appreciation Day" in the State of Missouri
Title
Designates the second Saturday of June each year as "Law Enforcement Appreciation Day" in the State of Missouri
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-31 | House | Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H) |
2017-01-12 | House | Referred: Crime Prevention and Public Safety(H) |
2017-01-05 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2017-01-04 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2016-12-20 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB295&year=2017&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills171/hlrbillspdf/0433H.01I.pdf |