MO HB2790 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 15 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-28 - HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 15 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-28 - HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes a visiting scholars certificate of license to teach
Title
Establishes a visiting scholars certificate of license to teach
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-28 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-04-28 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-04-26 | House | Referred: Select Committee on Education(H) |
2016-04-26 | House | Reported Do Pass with Amendments (H) - HCA 1 AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-04-25 | House | Voted Do Pass with Amendments (H) |
2016-04-25 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-04-04 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2016-03-31 | House | Referred: Elementary and Secondary Education(H) |
2016-03-16 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2016-03-15 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB2790&year=2016&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills161/billpdf/intro/HB2790I.PDF |