MO HB2432 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-26 - Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-26 - Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Returns the control of the City of St. Louis Police Department back to the Board of Police Commissioners
Title
Returns the control of the City of St. Louis Police Department back to the Board of Police Commissioners
Sponsors
Rep. Shane Roden [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-26 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2022-04-26 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 5 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2022-04-26 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2022-04-26 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2022-04-05 | House | Action Postponed (H) |
2022-04-05 | House | Executive Session Continued |
2022-03-29 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2022-03-24 | House | Referred: Public Safety(H) |
2022-01-13 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2022-01-12 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |