MO HB222 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-14 - Referred: Crime Prevention(H)
Pending: House Crime Prevention Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-14 - Referred: Crime Prevention(H)
Pending: House Crime Prevention Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increases the penalties for the offense of animal abuse and establishes an animal abuse registry
Title
Increases the penalties for the offense of animal abuse and establishes an animal abuse registry
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-14 | House | Referred: Crime Prevention(H) |
2021-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2021-01-06 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2020-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |