MO HB213 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-27 - Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-27 - Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies that any party who takes a deposition in a criminal case will be responsible for the costs of providing one copy of the transcript of the deposition to the opposing party
Title
Specifies that any party who takes a deposition in a criminal case will be responsible for the costs of providing one copy of the transcript of the deposition to the opposing party
Sponsors
Rep. Stanley Cox [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-27 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2013-02-27 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2013-02-13 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2013-01-31 | House | Referred: Judiciary(H) |
2013-01-22 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2013-01-17 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB213&year=2013&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills131/biltxt/intro/HB0213I.htm |