MO HB2112 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-14 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Special Committee on Government Accountability Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-14 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Special Committee on Government Accountability Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to sexual offenders
Title
Modifies provisions relating to sexual offenders
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Owen [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-14 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2022-01-13 | House | Referred: Special Committee on Government Accountability(H) |
2022-01-06 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2022-01-05 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2021-12-30 | House | Prefiled (H) |