MO HB2097 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-24 - Referred: Select Committee on Education(H)
Pending: House Select Committee on Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-24 - Referred: Select Committee on Education(H)
Pending: House Select Committee on Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Specifies circumstances in which athletic programs at public colleges and universities shall maintain athletic scholarships for student-athletes who are injured
Title
Specifies circumstances in which athletic programs at public colleges and universities shall maintain athletic scholarships for student-athletes who are injured
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-24 | House | Referred: Select Committee on Education(H) |
2016-02-24 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-02-23 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-02-23 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-02-02 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2016-01-14 | House | Referred: Higher Education(H) |
2016-01-11 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2016-01-07 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB2097&year=2016&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills161/billpdf/intro/HB2097I.PDF |