MO HB1990 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-28 - SCS Reported Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-28 - SCS Reported Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Allows a licensing exemption for certain nurses and requires an employer of nurses to verify the licensure status of applicants for nursing positions and at the time of the nurse's license renewal
Title
Allows a licensing exemption for certain nurses and requires an employer of nurses to verify the licensure status of applicants for nursing positions and at the time of the nurse's license renewal
Sponsors
Rep. Don Wells [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-28 | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) | |
2010-04-26 | Executive Session Held (S) - SCS VOTED DO PASS | |
2010-04-22 | Executive Session Scheduled - MONDAY, APRIL 26, 2010, 3:00P.M.SENATE COMMITTEE ROOM 2 | |
2010-04-19 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2010-04-15 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - MONDAY, APRIL 19, 2010, 1:00P.M.SENATE LOUNGE | |
2010-04-01 | Second Read and Referred: Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections (S) | |
2010-03-31 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2010-03-31 | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 144 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 | |
2010-03-30 | Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules (H) - This bill has remained on the HB for Perfection Consent Calendar for five legislative days withoutany objection, and any committee substitutes and committee amendments are hereby adopted by consent | |
2010-03-22 | Rules - Reported Do Pass Consent (H) | |
2010-03-22 | Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) | |
2010-03-22 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2010-03-18 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2010-03-18 | Reported Do Pass by Consent (H) | |
2010-03-18 | Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) | |
2010-03-18 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2010-03-03 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2010-02-25 | Refer: Spec Stand Com on Pro. Registration & Licensing (H) | |
2010-02-08 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2010-02-04 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |