MO HB1901 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-14 - Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H)
Pending: House Government Oversight and Accountability Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-14 - Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H)
Pending: House Government Oversight and Accountability Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding health care coverage
Title
Changes the laws regarding health care coverage
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-14 | House | Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H) |
2014-03-25 | House | Public Hearing Continued (H) |
2014-03-24 | House | Public Hearing Continued (H) |
2014-03-10 | House | Public Hearing Continued (H) |
2014-02-26 | House | Referred: Government Oversight and Accountability(H) |
2014-02-19 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2014-02-18 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1901&year=2014&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills141/biltxt/intro/HB1901I.htm |