MO HB1874 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-27 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-27 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Provides processes for the recorder of deeds to record electronic documents and procedures for remote online notarization.
Title
Provides processes for the recorder of deeds to record electronic documents and procedures for remote online notarization.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-27 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-03-12 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-03-12 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-03-05 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2020-03-05 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-03-04 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-03-04 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-02-26 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred: General Laws(H) |
2020-01-09 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2020-01-08 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2019-12-23 | House | Prefiled (H) |